GRACE INDEPENDENT BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith in accordance with the statement of faith in particular (but without limitation) by providing worship, prayer and Christian teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £46,300 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 September 2022: CIO registration
- GRACE CHAPEL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Saywell | Chair | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Williams Rogers | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua William Oliver | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING WORSHIP, PRAYER AND CHRISTIAN TEACHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRACE CHAPEL
GRACE HILL
FOLKESTONE
CT20 1HE
- Phone:
- 07792587156
- Email:
- andrewsaywell@mac.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window