UNA VOZ DE AYUDA (A VOICE OF SUPPORT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Una Voz de Ayuda (UVA)/ A voice of support is an organisation that supports Spanish speakers living in London/UK, it assists with emotional wellbeing by providing workshops to help people to overcome problems and develop strategies to cope. The workshops are in the form of group therapy. There is also 1-2-1 support by telephone helpline for people in crisis by calling our mobile number.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonio J Redondo | Chair | 27 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Ragel | Trustee | 27 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meury Febres | Trustee | 27 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: - TO RELIEVE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE EMOTIONAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. - TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, MIGRANT WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING INTERPRETING/ TRANSLATING/ ADVOCACY/ HEALTH/ HOUSING ADVICE AND EDUCATION. - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE VOLUNTEERS WHO ASSIST THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED SPANISH SPEAKING COMMUNITY IN ENGLAND IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Hollywood Road
LONDON
E4 8JE
- Phone:
- 07427624565
- Email:
- daymerfe@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window