THE IROCK TRUST

Charity Number: 1197511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Executive Summary The iRock Foundation will build classrooms in developing Countries, starting with Cambodia, and employ teachers to educate the students at Primary School level. Products and Services Our aim is to build classrooms in rural areas to provide up to 6 years Primary education to children who would otherwise be excluded from a State education. We will build the classroom, supply

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,500
Total expenditure: £6,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Gillman Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
Josh Franklin Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
John Franklin Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.61k £5.50k
Total expenditure £6.00k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
iRock
Wellesley House
10 Eelmoor Road
Farnborough
Hampshire
GU14 7QN
Phone:
07412628022
Website:

No information available