VAULT CREATIVE ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the arts for the public benefit, through promotion of and education in the arts, including (without limitation) drama, dance, literature, music and the visual arts, particularly, but not exclusively, by organising and delivering arts and cultural events and festivals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £3,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 March 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Francis Duggan | Chair | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise O'Donnell | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Shantell Lee-Ajala | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Amy Ruck | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Claire Lawson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82m | £156.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94m | £430.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £3.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £113.99k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.70m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.94m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH PROMOTION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) DRAMA, DANCE, LIVE PERFORMANCE, LITERATURE, MUSIC AND THE VISUAL ARTS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ORGANISING AND DELIVERING ARTS AND CULTURAL EVENTS AND FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 Lower Marsh
London
SE1 7AE
- Phone:
- 02076203364
- Email:
- hello@vaultcreativearts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window