BABULILM FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship, of people living in Pakistan, India, Iraq, and the UK, by making grants of money for providing or paying for items or services To advance education for the benefit of the poor and those in need, by means of making grants of money to fund educational activities and facilities in Pakistan, India, Indonesia, Philippines, Kenya,Iraq, Tanzaia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Malaysia
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
Governance
- 14 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Akbar Ali | Chair | 24 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rizwan Rahemtulla | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mehboob Hussein Suleman | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Syed Tahir Hassan | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Tahir Abbas Sayani | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Azhar Aijaz Abedi | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.14k | £301.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.92k | £237.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN PAKISTAN, INDIA, IRAQ, AND THE UK, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS OR SERVICES B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND THOSE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO FUND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN PAKISTAN, INDIA, IRAQ, AND THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Babulilm Foundation UK
4 Little Portland Street
Suite 110
LONDON
W1W 7JB
- Phone:
- +44 7424 836 337
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window