FOUNTAIN EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Islamic religion in the United Kingdom and the world for the benefit of those who are following or learning Islamic religion through arranging seminars and lectures, producing and distributing authentic literature on the teachings of Islam to enlighten others and help them to follow these teachings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2022: CIO registration
- FOUNTAIN INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ansar Shezad | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aftab Hussain | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anneel Majid | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.17k | £151.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.18k | £127.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 May 2025 | 96 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO ARE FOLLOWING OR LEARNING ISLAMIC RELIGION THROUGH ARRANGING SEMINARS AND LECTURES, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING AUTHENTIC LITERATURE ON THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS AND HELP THEM TO FOLLOW THESE TEACHINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LEICESTER ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8SF
- Phone:
- 07961919581
- Email:
- info@fountaininstitute.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window