FAMILY FOOD ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect donated food and toiletries from communities in the North Bristol area through a network of neighbourhood volunteers. Donations are allocated to our community partners who work directly with families and children in poverty. We also accept financial donations which are used to source bulk fresh produce from local suppliers for our partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 15 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alan Farmer | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Regan | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Reese | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stanley | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.56k | £74.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.67k | £74.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
'THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG FAMILIES IN BRISTOL WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT BUT PARTICULARLY THROUGH A) THE COLLECTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF FOOD AND TOILETRIES VIA COMMUNITY PARTNERS ALREADY WORKING WITH FAMILIES AND CHILDREN IN NEED, B) PROMOTING AND PRESERVING GOOD NUTRITION THROUGH AN EMPHASIS ON THE PROVISION OF FRESH PRODUCE, C) RAISING AWARENESS OF FOOD POVERTY AND PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR THE CHARITY’S ACTIVITIES, D) ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Bythesea Avenue
BRISTOL
BS7 0FN
- Phone:
- 07398732447
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window