SALFORD ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salford Astronomical Society is an open and inclusive society, respectful of the views and beliefs of others, with the aim to be a source of inspiration, knowledge and learning, and to provide a positive benefit for the local community. We strive to develop relationships with other organisations with similar interests and objectives, both locally and further afield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Salford City
Governance
- 07 February 2022: CIO registration
- SALFORD ASTRO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Lever | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony O'Sullivan | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Chandler | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John O'Brien | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie-Ann Fox | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bowditch | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £3.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £2.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2024 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF ASTRONOMY AND RELATED SUBJECTS BY: (A) ENCOURAGING THE PUBLIC INTEREST IN ASTRONOMY; (B) AND/OR CIRCULATING CURRENT ASTRONOMICAL INFORMATION; (C) AND/OR FURTHERING THE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC AND OF MEMBERS, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE ACTIVE PROMOTION OF AND PARTICIPATION IN OBSERVATIONAL ASTRONOMY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHASELEY ROAD OBSERVATORY
CHASELEY ROAD
SALFORD
M6 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01617378382
- Email:
- info@salfordastro.org.uk
- Website:
-
salfordastro.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window