BEIS YOSEF ZVI

Charity number: 1197878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit to promote the education of children and young people on the subject of the Orthodox Jewish culture, history, religion and tradition, in particular but not exclusively by providing supplementary Jewish education for young children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,480
Total expenditure: £78,236

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yaakov Dov Davidoviz Chair 10 February 2022
None on record
YESHAYAHU ABELES Trustee 10 February 2022
SYNAGOGUE MAHARIM DUSHINSKY LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £68.48k
Total expenditure £1.68k £78.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
76 Olinda Road
LONDON
N16 6TP
Phone:
07392310017
Website:

No information available