ROMANIAN WOOFERS NEED YOU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and in particular to assist with food and veterinary aid to animals in the care of our beneficiaries in Romania as well as to coordinate the preparation and transport to the UK of suitable animals for domestic rehoming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Romania
Governance
- 23 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Holmes | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Keeling | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Hodgins | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.30k | £170.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.07k | £165.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS IN ROMANIA AND THE UK, BY: A) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN ROMANIA WHICH PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE; B) PARTNERING WITH CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN ROMANIA AND THE UK TO ASSESS IF ANIMALS RESCUED IN ROMANIA ARE SUITABLE FOR ADOPTION IN THE UK AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, TO UNDERTAKE ALL REQUIRED HEALTH AND BEHAVIOUR SCREENING AND ARRANGEMENTS TO FACILITATE THEIR SAFE TRANSPORTATION TO THE UK AND SUBSEQUENT REHOMING.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 SHEFFIELD ROAD
GLOSSOP
SK13 8QJ
- Phone:
- 07852264837
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window