SPORTS FOR SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Capacity building, outreach activities, Sports (football), research, workshops, seminars
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sierra Leone
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 March 2022: CIO registration
- SPOTS FOR SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibrahim Sesay | Chair | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Haja Kadijah Anashe Sesay | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Munetsi | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/02/2023 | 25/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £10.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £9.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SIERRA LEONE, GAMBIA AND UGANDA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TOWARDS SPORTS, EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 VIOLETTE SZABO HOUSE
HAMILTON ROAD
SE27 9RU
- Phone:
- +447460945232
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window