St Marks School Natland PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations made to school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 14 September 1987: Standard registration
- ST MARKS COFE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- St Marks School Natland PTA (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S SCHOOL (Previous name)
- ST MARK'S C OF E SCHOOL, NATLAND PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jones | Chair | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Clarke | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Hinton | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.87k | £6.01k | £2.52k | £1.05k | £9.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £26.69k | £2.09k | £137 | £8.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 2005 as amended on 01 May 2019 as amended on 07 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORAMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marks C of E School
Oxenholme Lane
Natland
KENDAL
LA9 7QH
- Phone:
- 01539560719
- Website:
-
st-marks.cumbria.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window