CENTRAL CHURCH WARRINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday and midweek services, Bible study groups, exploring Christianity courses, prayer meetings, religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £11,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warrington
Governance
- 24 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Klein | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ridout | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Liggins | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gareth Ashley Cooper | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Lynn James | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Neil Tomlinson | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.91k | £73.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.49k | £62.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY WITHIN WARRINGTON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM, OR THE WORLD, AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 GREEN LANE
PADGATE
WARRINGTON
WA1 4JG
- Phone:
- 01925850014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window