REALISE ONE

Charity number: 1197904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising awareness and profile of humanitarian projects concerning primarily but not limited to the Panjabi community around the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Harjap Singh Bhangal Trustee 14 February 2023
None on record
Jarnail Singh Dulai Trustee 14 February 2022
None on record
Gurpreet Singh Sidhu Trustee 14 February 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2024 345 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Realise One
45-47 HIGH STREET
WEST BROMWICH
B70 6PB
Phone:
07973232468