A PLATFORM TO TALK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Platform to Talk has a Facebook group. Users of the group are supported by trustees, counsellors and peers who use their own personal experiences to assist others. We organise community events such as walks, workshops and provide resources to enable sufferers to find professional, affordable and accessible help. We fund the delivery of one to one counselling sessions & MHFA England courses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Theresa Lilian Gibbs | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Pritchard | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Jackson | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/06/2023 | 06/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.49k | £16.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.51k | £11.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 June 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 June 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 328 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-MENTAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF ON-LINE PEER SUPPORT GROUPS TO PROVIDE ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND PROMOTE BEST PRACTICES IN THE FIELD OF MENTAL HEALTH AND WELFARE B) THE PROVISION OF ON-LINE AND PHYSICAL COMMUNITY EVENTS SUCH AS WALKS OR GROUP MEETINGS, WORKSHOPS AND PROVIDING RESOURCES TO ENABLE SUFFERERS TO FIND PROFESSIONAL, AFFORDABLE AND ACCESSIBLE HELP C) FUNDING THE DELIVERY OF MENTAL HEALTH 1ST AID WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF NORTHEAST LINCOLNSHIRE D) FUNDING FOR THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH COUNSELLING SUPPORT E) PROMOTING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o SOURCE FOUR
THE OLD GRANARY
AYLESBY
GRIMSBY
DN37 7AW
- Phone:
- 01472348440
- Email:
- aplatformtotalk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window