BLACK BRITISH INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Black British Initiative, believes, racial injustice is a societal wide issue, only eradicated with the support of all races, genders and age groups. To deliver its mission, in partnership with the Stephen Lawrence Day Foundation, BBI has devised MBA 30, as short business course designed to boost prospects for 30 underserved Black Entrepreneurs, also commemorating Stephen's 30th anniversary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Brook-Carter | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Bishton | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andreas Xeni | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Jade Aryiku | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £415.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £216.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (I) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF DIVERSITY AND INCLUSION IN THE ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO BRITISH PERSONS OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE; B. PROMOTING ACCESS TO AND THE BENEFITS OF FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG BRITISH PEOPLE OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE; C. PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, SUCH AS THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY SHOWCASING THE WORKS OF ARTISTS OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE; (II) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY INCLUDING BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS INCLUDING BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (III) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PERSONS OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PERSONS OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 3(III) ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY REASON OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; EXPERIENCE PUBLIC CARE OR THE PENAL SYSTEM; (IV) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, INCLUDING BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. PROMOTING ACCESS TO FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE; AND B. THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUMS AND/OR ART GALLERIES ABOUT THE HISTORY OF PERSONS OF AFRICAN OR AFRO-CARIBBEAN HERITAGE IN THE UK AND THEIR CONTRIBUTION TO CULTURE AND THE ARTS IN THE UK, BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HAY HILL LTD
12 HAY HILL
LONDON
W1J 8NR
- Phone:
- 02071181202
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window