DAR AL-ISLAM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Activities, Arabic and Quran classes, Recreational Activities Jujitsu Classes, young children football club, Facilities for worship and events Friday prayer, Ramadan programme, Muharram Programme, Marriage, Nikah and spouse selection service, Funeral Services, Spiritual trips, Ask the Imam Service, Library Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mousa Baraka | Chair | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abother Al-Saraj | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hussain | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hussain Al-Najafi | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.60k | £262.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.63k | £231.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND EVENTS, FACILITIES FOR MARRIAGE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF MUSLIM SHIA ITHNA-ASHARI FAITH. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS TUITIONS, NURSERIES AND SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 ANSON ROAD
LONDON
NW2 3UY
- Phone:
- 02084523220
- Email:
- info@dar.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window