WESTERN FELLS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved. Taking religious assemblies in local schools. Promoting the whole mission of the church (& aiding social cohesion) through activities for older people, parents and toddlers & other specific need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK & overseas financially & with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

44 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 07 February 2022: Standard registration
- 06 October 2023: Funds received from 1135447 SOLWAY METHODIST CIRCUIT
- WFMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glynis Hayton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Samantha Jane Morris | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Howell | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Waite | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Kilworth-Mason | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Nancy Powell-Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Evan Hasson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Holliday | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Herbert | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Holliday | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Albon | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Viv Kendall | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Christian | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hanshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Murphy | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Bignell | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Reynolds | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Stevenson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Lunson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lennox | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Hymers | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas McDevitte | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Bingham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harold | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Coyles | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Owens | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eva Ackerlay | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Holliday | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Anthony Potts | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morna Lesley McDowell | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WATTS | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DAVIES | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DAVID ADAMSON | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth WOOLLARD | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|||||
ALISTAIR BELL | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FEARON | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE CYRIL ATKINSON | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY NEVINSON | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ATHRON COLLINS | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gwynneth Anne Everett Councillor | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Ivor Davies | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HASSON | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.14k | £195.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.71k | £287.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLYBUSH HOUSE
45 THE PARKLANDS
COCKERMOUTH
CA13 0XJ
- Phone:
- 01900823273
- Website:
-
HTTPS://WWW.WESTERNFELLS.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window