THE FOXGLOVE COVERT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote, encourage and facilitate for the benefit of the public in and around Foxglove Covert Local Nature Reserve through: the conservation, protection, improvement of the physical and natural environment; research and learning for the advancement of knowledge in the natural sciences and biodiversity; educational and social value of the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £50,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 February 2022: CIO registration
- 10 February 2023: Funds received from 1089020 FOXGLOVE COVERT LOCAL NATURE RESERVE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Simpson | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Nicola Jane Lancaster | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Waldron | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Walker | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100.90k | £73.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £74.33k | £63.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.00k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AND AROUND FOXGLOVE COVERT LOCAL NATURE RESERVE: THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; RESEARCH AND LEARNING FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES AND BIODIVERSITY; EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL VALUE OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARMY TRAINING ESTATE (NE)
DOWNHOLME
RICHMOND
DL11 6AH
- Phone:
- 01748830045
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window