WINSLEY ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1197674
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a small committee run village preschool in a rural community in Wiltshire, and have our own purpose built building on the primary school site. We offer care and learning for children ages 2-5 years during school term time, and normal school hours. We accept the 15 hours funding and 30 hours (income dependent) funding offered by the government, for those children over three years and also

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £62,802
Total expenditure: £77,159

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 2022: CIO registration
  • 26 October 2023: Funds received from 1029827 WINSLEY ACORNS PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Clutterbuck Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Donna Marie Spence Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Jay Palmer Trustee 22 November 2023
None on record
Hayley Sutherland Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Chloe Kershaw Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Joanna Forbes Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Rebecca Strike Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £0 £62.80k
Total expenditure £0 £77.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 July 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 July 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 September 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 September 2023 87 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WINSLEY ACORNS PRE SCHOOL
TYNING ROAD
WINSLEY
BRADFORD-ON-AVON
BA15 2JN
Phone:
01225865131