GSE U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop good citizenship, character and Christian beliefs among young people who are both self-reliant and useful to others by embodying the practice of scouting, as inherited from Robert Baden-Powell and enriched by Fr Jacques Sevin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2022: CIO registration
- GUIDES AND SCOUTS OF EUROPE - UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Colquhoun | Chair | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Davis | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Anthony Hallam | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hammond | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.87k | £18.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £14.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAY 2022 AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP GOOD CITIZENSHIP, CHARACTER AND CHRISTIAN BELIEFS AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE BOTH SELF-RELIANT AND USEFUL TO OTHERS BY EMBODYING THE PRACTICE OF SCOUTING, AS INHERITED FROM ROBERT BADEN-POWELL AND ENRICHED BY FR JACQUES SEVIN AND AS ESTABLISHED INTERNATIONALLY BY ORGANISATIONS AFFILIATED TO THE UNION INTERNATIONALE DES GUIDES ET SCOUTS D’EUROPE – FÉDÉRATION DU SCOUTISME EUROPÉEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREYSTONES
WASHINGTON
NE37 1NT
- Phone:
- 01914154555
- Email:
- paul@hammond.me
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window