Bishnat

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold Jewish music concerts in various locations for various communities to appreciate the music and learn about the music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 25 January 2022: CIO registration
- BISHNAT 2021 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HILTON NATHANSON | Chair | 02 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bearman | Trustee | 02 January 2022 |
|
|||||
NAOMI NEVIES | Trustee | 02 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.94k | £155.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.11k | £152.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2022 as amended on 25 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, DEVELOP AND PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC, THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, PROVIDE CHOIR SERVICES TO VARIOUS COMMUNITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BISHNAT
55 BAKER STREET
LONDON
W1U 8EW
- Phone:
- 02030238200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window