BEYOND EDUCATION SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beyond Education Sports Foundation provides support and activities which help develop the skills, capacity and capabilities of young people.The charity advances and promotes community development, providing young people with access to facilities, training and opportunities to participate in sport, leisure,volunteer activities and vocational related training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,495 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eugene Dwaah | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mahadi Hassan | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Paisley | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.50k | £36.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.05k | £64.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £24.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
PROVIDING RELIEF TO UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN (AGED 8-19 YEARS), ACROSS LONDON, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MULTIPLE SPORTS ACTIVITIES. THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION TO DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE (UPTO 19 YEARS), ACROSS LONDON, WHO ARE IN DANGER OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION, HAVE DISENGAGED FROM SCHOOL OR NOT IN EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT OR TRAINING (NEET).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pavilion
Stonebridge Recreation Ground
Hillside
LONDON
NW10 8LW
- Phone:
- 0772270051
- Email:
- dwaah@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window