FRIENDS OF CROFTLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ptfa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 February 2022: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CROFTLANDS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Hardisty | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rogers | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Bayliff BA FCA | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.67k | £106.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.18k | £105.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 April 2024 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 14 April 2024 | 227 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croftlands Junior School
Oakwood Drive
Ulverston
Cumbria
LA12 9JU
- Phone:
- 01229585211
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window