BLOSSOMS LONDON LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides constructive and positive activities for economically, physically, emotionally, and socially disadvantaged children in the locality. Blossoms London Ltd proactively develops social enrichment programs to reach as large a diverse catchment of young people as possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 29 March 2022: Standard registration
- 06 July 2023: Funds received from 261179 THE H J CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leah Weiss | Chair | 27 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Gitel Erlich | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
RABBI MORDECHAI STEREN | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.05k | £77.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.64k | £77.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR DISABLED AND OR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS, PROGRAMMES, SERVICES AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO: A)ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B)PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
362 CRAVEN PARK ROAD
LONDON
N15 6AG
- Phone:
- 02088020322
- Email:
- gittyerlich@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window