Cyfraith Gymunedol y Gogledd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a steering group working together to launch a Law Centre for north Wales. The Centre will provide legal advice, assistance and representation to those who would otherwise be unable to afford it, and public legal education. It will employ lawyers and caseworkers to provide legal services directly to clients, and will aim to provide services under the legal aid scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 04 February 2022: CIO registration
- North Wales Community Law (Working name)
- NORTH WALES LAW CENTRE (Working name)
- CANOLFAN GYFRAITH Y GOGLEDD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crash WIGLEY | Chair | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Anthony Lothian-Field | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jason Edwards | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jabez Andrew Oakes | Trustee | 11 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Carl Newman | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Wilkins | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Acton Myles Afonso | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Joseph Davison | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Court | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan James | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Neil Scrase | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.86k | £147.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.60k | £119.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Feb 2022 as amended on 29 Feb 2024 as amended on 13 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN WALES AND THE NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO THOSE WHO WOULD BE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO AFFORD IT AND BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON LEGAL RIGHTS AND OBLIGATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEULWEN
GLYN Y MARL ROAD
CYFFORDD LLANDUDNO
LL31 9NS
- Phone:
- 07715467039
- Email:
- info@nwlcsteering.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window