SOWS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1197951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide opportunities to develop financial literacy and entrepreneurial skills to motivated individuals who want to become self sufficient. We ease this process by providing financial and emotional boosts in the initial stage,and during crises or hard times to benefit themselves and their dependents. SOWS: Secure Our Work Stability The advancement of Jewish Culture.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Grauman Chair 10 May 2021
BAIT LIMUD VCHESED
Received: On time
REVACH VEHAZOLA TRUST
Received: On time
David Landesman Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Yaakov Yosef Meir Wohl Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £580.46k
Total expenditure £3.32k £569.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £580.46k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £0
Income - Other N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £559.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £9.88k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £250.32k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A £0
Other assets N/A £14.41k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £1.32k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 01 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FLAT 3 MAY COURT
FOUNTAYNE ROAD
LONDON
N16 7EB
Phone:
07908516776
Website:

No information available