GRENFELL ATHLETIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grenfell Athletic was set up to encourage participation in healthy recreational activity for members of the communities of Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Hammersmith and Fulham and Westminster through the provision of football. We have mens and womens team and encourage all members of our community to take part in team sports to improve their physical and mental wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 23 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Rivers Mr | Chair | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles-Brady | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Taylor | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FOWLER | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Freddie Morris | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.81k | £84.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.80k | £54.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 APR 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 NOV 2021 as amended on 27 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
The advancement of education and the relief of poverty by the provision of mentoring programmes and other schemes designed to offer educational opportunities and resources to young people from disadvantaged socioeconomic backgrounds in the Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, and the Boroughs of Hammersmith and Fulham and Westminster. The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea, Hammersmith and Fulham and Westminster and surrounding areas by the provision of the facilities of football.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 LAMBTON PLACE
LONDON
W11 2SH
- Phone:
- 07949416561
- Email:
- info@grenfellathletic.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window