Accounts and annual returns GUILD OF ONE-NAME STUDIES CIO

Charity number: 1197944
Charity reporting is up to date (249 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 March 2025 249 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window