Fir Tree Primary PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fir Tree Primary PTFA fundraises to support the educational curriculum led by Fir Tree Primary school by organising events for the school & wider community. We raise money through activities like bake sales, activities for the school children and family fun days, helping to enhance students' learning experience with resources, equipment, and extracurricular opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 03 March 2022: Standard registration
- FIR TREE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- FIR TREE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Purcell | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Steer | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2022 as amended on 17 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIR TREE PRIMARY SCHOOL & NURSERY
FIR TREE LANE
NEWBURY
BERKSHIRE
RG14 2RA
- Phone:
- 0163542129
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window