POTHI SEVA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a conservation service for printed and manuscript heritage, primarily sacred texts from the Sikh tradition. We provide preservation advice for individuals as well as Gurdwaras and institutions who are custodians of printed and manuscript heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 April 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasdip Dhillon BA MA PGCE | Chair | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Navjot Singh Samplay | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanpreet Singh Kahlon | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jivanpal Singh Bansal BA, MA | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandave Singh | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Kaur Bhachu | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasdip Singh Dhillon BA,MA,PGCE | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Sukhraj Singh Dosanjh | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.08k | £18.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | £9.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF PRINTED AND MANUSCRIPT HERITAGE OF HISTORIC MERIT, PRIMARILY SACRED TEXTS FROM THE SIKH TRADITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Rowland Hill Court
Osney Lane
OXFORD
OX1 1LE
- Phone:
- 07821269324
- Email:
- sevadar@pothiseva.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window