Accounts and annual returns THE DAVID AND CHRISTOPHER LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 519329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 February 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required