Financial history THE DAVID AND CHRISTOPHER LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 519329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.61k £12.28k £10.33k £12.10k £13.80k
Total expenditure £5.75k £10.00k £0 £18.68k £5.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A