THE DAVID AND CHRISTOPHER LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation was established in memory of John and Nellie Lewis by their sons, David and Christopher. We support Welsh Arts, Culture, Heritage, and Language through small grants towards heritage sites, arts programs, educational institutions and museums. We fund projects to protect Wales' natural beauty, promote sustainable tourism, and encourage learning about Welsh arts, culture, and language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 07 October 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lewis | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Davita Morgan PhD | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paivi Inkeri Koskinen-Lewis | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Owen Lewis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.61k | £12.28k | £10.33k | £12.10k | £13.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £10.00k | £0 | £18.68k | £5.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 23 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY IN WALES AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN WALES TO CREATE A UNIVERSITY CHAIR IN TOURISM STUDIES IN A WELSH UNIVERSITY TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS AND FELLOWSHIPS TO STUDENTS OF WELSH EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS TO ATTEND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS AND FELLOWSHIPS TO STUDENTS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO ATTEND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN WALES (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4A OF DEED).
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE HORSES
WOODEND LANE
LANGLAND
SWANSEA
SA3 4QG
- Phone:
- 01792361091
- Email:
- dandcfoundation@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window