CLECKHEATON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1198915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide emergency food and other essential to people in need in Cleckheaton and the surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £26,869
Total expenditure: £34,033

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Josephine Pugsley Chair 15 December 2021
None on record
Janet Balmforth Trustee 07 October 2023
None on record
Stephen Dinsmore Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Rev Marian Olsen Trustee 17 December 2021
None on record
Rev Sally Wallace Jones Trustee 17 December 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.31k £26.87k
Total expenditure £25.57k £34.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.75k £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o CLECKHEATON METHODIST CHURCH
MORTIMER STREET
CLECKHEATON
BD19 5AR
Phone:
07955732598