THE CLUSTER FOR RESEARCH INTO COACHING

Charity Number: 1198423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Cluster for Research into Coaching (CRiC) aims to promote, support and conduct research for the benefit of sport coaches, National Governing Bodies, non-Governmental Organisations, sport coaching scholars, students and other related practitioners. CRiC runs in-person and virtual research seminars and other events to support these aims.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £7,271
Total expenditure: £5,399

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 March 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CLUSTER FOR RESEARCH INTO COACHING (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Robyn Lloyd Jones Chair 29 March 2022
None on record
Dr Anna Stodter Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Dr Donald Richard Vinson Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Dr Charles Corsby Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.83k £7.27k
Total expenditure £5.12k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 SOVEREIGN CHASE
STAUNTON
GLOUCESTER
GL19 3NW
Phone:
01452849316