Eric Hardy Empowerment Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wildlife conservation & the burial of humans in nature reserves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 October 1987: Standard registration
- 09 October 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 November 2017: Re-registered
- ERIC HARDY EMPOWERMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- HARROGATE TRUST FOR WILDLIFE PROTECTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
xx MICHAEL FOOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE THORP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57 | £4.30k | £6.21k | £2.97k | £8.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £800 | £0 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1986, 12 SEPTEMBER 1987, 20 MAY 1991, 28 FEBRUARY 1997, 24 OCTOBER 1997 AND 12 DECEMBER 2010. as amended on 01 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE TO SAFEGUARD GENETIC DIVERSITY; (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT WILDLIFE, TO INCREASE UNDERSTANDING AND AN APPRECIATION OF NATURE, ITS VALUE AND THE NEED FOR CONSERVATION; (C) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO MAKE PROVISION FOR BURIALS, WHETHER SECULAR OR OTHERWISE, AND THE RE-BURIAL OF EXHUMED REMAINS, INCLUDING HELP WITH EXHUMATIONS FROM ANY LAND, WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE RELEVANT LAWS FROM TIME TO TIME IN FORCE AND TO PERMIT SUCH BURIALS OR RE-BURIALS (INCLUDING THE OCCASIONAL BURIAL OF PETS) IN APPROPRIATE NATURE RESERVES OR OTHER LAND MAINTAINED BY THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
HARROGATE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 KNOX ROAD
HARROGATE
NORTH YORKSHIRE
HG1 3EF
- Phone:
- 01423530900
- Email:
- empowertoprotect@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window