Governing document Eric Hardy Empowerment Trust

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1986, 12 SEPTEMBER 1987, 20 MAY 1991, 28 FEBRUARY 1997, 24 OCTOBER 1997 AND 12 DECEMBER 2010. as amended on 01 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(A) TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE TO SAFEGUARD GENETIC DIVERSITY; (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT WILDLIFE, TO INCREASE UNDERSTANDING AND AN APPRECIATION OF NATURE, ITS VALUE AND THE NEED FOR CONSERVATION; (C) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO MAKE PROVISION FOR BURIALS, WHETHER SECULAR OR OTHERWISE, AND THE RE-BURIAL OF EXHUMED REMAINS, INCLUDING HELP WITH EXHUMATIONS FROM ANY LAND, WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE RELEVANT LAWS FROM TIME TO TIME IN FORCE AND TO PERMIT SUCH BURIALS OR RE-BURIALS (INCLUDING THE OCCASIONAL BURIAL OF PETS) IN APPROPRIATE NATURE RESERVES OR OTHER LAND MAINTAINED BY THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
HARROGATE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.