CHALCRAFT GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides and maintains gospel halls for religious activities of Christans often referred to as 'Brethren'. Details of the origins, teachings and way of life of the Brethren can be found on their website www.plymouthbrethrenchristianchurch.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 June 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Brendan Evershed | Chair | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trent Matthew Napthine | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Thomas Napthine | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Boyd McIntyre | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Garth Robin Elkins | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.38k | £44.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.33k | £32.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BY THE CARRYING ON OF THE SERVICE OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE HOLY BIBLE AS FOLLOWED BY THOSE CHRISTIANS FORMING PART OF A WORLD-WIDE FELLOWSHIP KNOWN AS THE 'PLYMOUTH BRETHREN CHRISTIAN CHURCH' (THE 'BRETHREN') WHOSE CORE DOCTRINE IS SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 1 TO THIS DEED AND WHOSE PROPER PRACTICES IN FURTHERANCE OF SOME ASPECTS OF THAT CORE DOCTRINE ARE SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THIS DEED; AND B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH BRETHREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRETHREN MEETING ROOMS
GOSPEL HALL
CHALCRAFT LANE
BOGNOR REGIS
PO21 5TX
- Phone:
- 07385965106
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window