Aslan Ministries

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith through teaching, education and compassionate care by raising awareness of the Christian message, the production and dissemination of printed and audio-visual materials for the public benefit and all of humanity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- France
- Jordan
- Lebanon
Governance
- 13 May 2022: CIO registration
- COLIN DYE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Dye | Chair | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Payne | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Charles Montague Moore | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 May 2022 as amended on 09 May 2024
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH TEACHING, EDUCATION AND COMPASSIONATE CARE BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE, THE PRODUCTION AND DISSEMINATION OF PRINTED AND AUDIO-VISUAL MATERIALS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ALL OF HUMANITY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO ATTACHED. (2) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ADVOCATING HUMAN RIGHTS AND RELIEVING THE NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 MOUNT PARK ROAD
LONDON
W5 2RS
W5 2RS
- Phone:
- 07825076528
- Email:
- colin.dyews@gmail.com
- Website:
-
HTTPS://COLINDYE.COM/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window