JAMIA NIZAMIA CHARITY

Charity number: 1197846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity offers outstanding educational & cultural services, Islamic counselling, seminars, and events for the youth and the community of Derby, alongside a fully functioning mosque with daily prayer services, Islamic classes and Friday sermons. The Nizamia Foundation is the perfect place to foster the hearts and minds of British Muslims.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £12,401
Total expenditure: £8,091

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 February 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • The Nizamia Foundation (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zulkifal Hussain Sabir Chair 08 February 2022
None on record
Aamenah Jabeen Sabir Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Hamid Raza Mujtaba Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Raza Ul Mustafa Sabir Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.01k £23.03k £12.40k
Total expenditure £3.16k £15.25k £8.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 05 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 GOODALE STREET
DERBY
DE23 8QE
Phone:
07938892763