FRIENDS OF HOLT ISLAND NATURE RESERVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends are instrumental in preserving a unique natural habitat that has developed from an area that formerly provided employment and prosperity for the town of St Ives for centuries. It achieves this by providing finance and support to enhance access, habitat management, species monitoring, infrastructure improvement, publicity and education on the Island
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Michael Reed | Chair | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Victor Grimwade | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David George Street | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy James Knight | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Amanda Cripps | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BASIL JAMES BELCHER FCInstCES | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN DAVID LIMENTANI | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Norman Jackson | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jill Elizabeth Burt | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALAN CLAYDON | Trustee | 30 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Sprowell | Trustee | 16 July 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.67k | £13.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £13.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF HOLT ISLAND NATURE RESERVE, AND ASSOCIATED SITES INCLUDING THE THICKET AND WILHORN MEADOW, BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 REDWELL CLOSE
ST. IVES
PE27 6NY
- Phone:
- 01480497592
- Email:
- enquiries@holtisland.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window