ST MICHAEL'S RC PRIMARY PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to enhance the whole school experience of every child attending St Michaels, bringing families together and strengthening home/school relationships whilst embedding our school into the heart of our community. We raise funds through school an community activities and events and support the school with non statutory equipment and resources to ensure all children enjoy amazing opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 27 January 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Bonham | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Wadsley | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Tams | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | £2.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £2.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MICHAELS RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
CLUMBER STREET NORTH
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 7RE
- Phone:
- 01912739383
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window