CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS IN NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1203907
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Newcastle Cathedral provides a regular pattern of worship. It offers a welcome to all who enter ~ and pastoral care to those in need of it. The Lantern Initiative is a key part of our life, and ensures support is offered to the homeless and those suffering with addiction. Our Music Team actively works with schools in disadvantaged areas to give them opportunities to sing in our choir.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gateshead
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWCASTLE CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Helen Lesley Paterson Trustee 06 November 2024
CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP (TYNEDALE)
Received: On time
Rev Zoe Norah Heming Trustee 14 September 2024
None on record
Rev Ruth Carole Hulse Trustee 13 July 2024
None on record
The Very Reverend Lee Paul Batson Trustee 14 October 2023
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
DAME ALLAN'S SCHOOLS
Received: 9 days late
Gavin MacFarlane Black Trustee 01 July 2023
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE CHARLOTTE STRAKER PROJECT
Received: On time
HEART OF THE CITY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR THOMLINSON'S LIBRARY AND THE ENDOWNMENT OF WALTER BLACKETT
Received: On time
ISABEL WRIGHTSON
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
John Arthur Inglis-Jones Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
The Venerable Rachel Astrid Wood Trustee 01 September 2021
CHARITY OF BISHOP CHANDLER (NEWCASTLE BRANCH)
Received: On time
David John Dennis Lawrence Trustee 01 April 2016
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR THOMLINSON'S LIBRARY AND THE ENDOWNMENT OF WALTER BLACKETT
Received: On time
ISABEL WRIGHTSON
Received: On time
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Eric Jubb Trustee 01 December 2014
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
ISABEL WRIGHTSON
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR THOMLINSON'S LIBRARY AND THE ENDOWNMENT OF WALTER BLACKETT
Received: On time
HEART OF THE CITY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
TOGETHER NEWCASTLE
Received: On time
Edna Beveridge Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
David Robert Bilton Trustee 01 November 2011
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TYNEMOUTH PRIORY HOLY SAVIOUR, TYNEMOUTH
Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR THOMLINSON'S LIBRARY AND THE ENDOWNMENT OF WALTER BLACKETT
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
ISABEL WRIGHTSON
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Cathedral House
42 Mosley Street
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE1 1DF
Phone:
01912321939