LONDON CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF CONTEMPORARY ANTISEMITISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public events (online seminars, in-person lectures, international conferences) to meet objectives. Publish academic books on contemporary antisemitism. Apply for funding to commission research into contemporary antisemitism. 2 annual prizes; the Book Prize for best book on contemporary antisemitism, and the Pete Newbon award for greatest contribution to the public understanding of antisemitism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2022: CIO registration
- LONDON ANTISEMITISM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Alexandra Henry | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Gerber | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael A Salberg | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Wollman BA, BPhil | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Bryan Spitz LLB MA JD | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Antony Adams | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.15k | £197.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.66k | £53.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.06k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN RELATION TO THE DEFINITION, HISTORY, CAUSES, EFFECTS AND PREVENTION OF ANTISEMITISM; AND 2. TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BETWEEN JEWISH PEOPLE WHEREVER IN THE WORLD AND OTHER MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY THE ELIMINATION OF ANTISEMITISM, INCLUDING RAISING AWARENESS OF THE OCCURRENCE OF ANTISEMITISM AND PROVIDING ADVOCACY, ASSISTANCE, CARE AND RELIEF IN RELATION TO THOSE AFFECTED BY ANTISEMITISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 136
116 Ballards Lane
London
N3 2DN
- Phone:
- 00000000001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window