Financial history GREATER MANCHESTER BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 519386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.58k £48.69k £40.08k £88.13k £39.58k
Total expenditure £42.62k £34.27k £41.20k £55.66k £71.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £44.10k £21.25k £10.00k N/A