WENTWORTH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The area of benefit to be defined as the civil Parish of Wentworth The objects of the charity are: The general benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit in such charitable ways as the trustees think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 12 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR PHILIP NAYLOR-LEYLAND Bt. | Chair | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Cynthia Shaw MBE | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ALEXANDER WILLIAM JAMES DAVIES-TERRY | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
James Henry John Behrens | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
DAVID HUNTON | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
SUSAN JOAN CLAYTON | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF WENTWORTH (THE ?AREA OF BENEFIT?) IN SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WHICH MAY INCLUDE (BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1.1 THE PROVISION OF, OR SUPPORT FOR: 3.1.1.1 FACILITIES AND EVENTS FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.1.1.2 PUBLIC AMENITIES INCLUDING SCHOOL, COMMUNITY BUILDINGS, PLACES OF WORSHIP AND CEMETERIES ETC.; 3.1.1.3 COMMUNITY FACILITIES SUCH AS TRANSPORT; 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE (EXPRESSLY TO INCLUDE MUSIC AND CHOIRS); 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT; 3.1.4 MEETING THE COST, IN WHOLE OR PART, OF THE PROVISION OF A VICAR, PRIEST IN CHARGE OR PATRON?S CHAPLAIN WITH RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, WENTWORTH; 3.1.5 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) BUT WHO IS: 3.1.5.1 RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR 3.1.5.2 ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3.1.6 PROMOTING EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, WHICH MAY INCLUDE: 3.1.6.1 SUPPORT FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATION OR UNDERTAKING TRAINING OR AN APPRENTICESHIP; AND/OR 3.1.6.2 SUPPORT FOR ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR APPRENTICESHIPS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3.2 IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS IN CLAUSE 3.1, THE CIO MAY ASSIST ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS BY: 3.2.1 MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; 3.2.2 PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; 3.2.3 MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED; AND/OR 3.2.4 MAKING SECURED OR UNSECURED LOANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FITZWILLIAM WENTWORTH ESTATE
27 CLAYFIELDS LANE
WENTWORTH
ROTHERHAM
S62 7TD
- Phone:
- 01226742041
- Email:
- office@wentworthestate.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window