WESTWARD HO! BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian faith under the auspices of the Baptist denomination. Junior Church for children. Meetings for people not connected with the church of all ages and gender.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 24 February 2022: CIO registration
- 07 June 2024: Funds received from 1137504 WESTWARD HO BAPTIST CHURCH
- WESTWARD HO BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev TIMOTHY CHARLES SUTTON | Chair | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Fish | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harry James Frisby | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Frances Ousley | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roderick John Smith | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Jeffrey Boys | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Wilson | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NICHOLAS HOPKINSON | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.86k | £117.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.56k | £122.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westward Ho! Baptist Church
NELSON DRIVE
WESTWARD HO
BIDEFORD
EX39 1LQ
- Phone:
- 01237 423226
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window