THE ELLIOT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Elliot Project currently provide training and environments for individuals to come and learn and speak openly about their mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Loscar Rigby | Chair | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ann Hennell | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Hennell | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harley Marie McCarthy | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Margaret Horner | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owen Ross OBrien Speirs | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF INDIVIDUALS ABOVE THE AGE OF 18 WITHIN THE UK, SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PTSD, DEPRESSION AND ANXIETY THROUGH: 1. THE PROVISION OF MENTAL HEALTH COURSES AND ONE-TO-ONE COACHING TO BE PROVIDED BY SELECTED PARTNERING ORGANISATIONS 2. TO CREATE AND MAINTAIN A NETWORK OF VOLUNTEERS, TO BENEFIT THE WELLBEING OF THE PUBLIC SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH WITHIN THE UK 3. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FREE INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Gleneagles Road
Boorley Green
Southampton
SO32 2SJ
SO32 2SJ
- Phone:
- 07547642126
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window