THE WELLS CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion and to be part of God's transforming work in our community. Such other charitable purposes as shall further the attainment of the above of the church.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 30 April 2024: CIO registration
- T W C F (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian St John Martin | Chair | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bodun Rabiu | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Winter | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Hughes | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
STUART GUY MAYHO | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (?THE OBJECTS?) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOOD OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wells Church
Hanover Road
HANOVER ROAD
Tunbridge Wells
TN1 1EY
- Phone:
- 01892521320
- Email:
- office@thewellschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.